Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Yadullahi Muhammad, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Depaola, Samuel Christopher, Sim, Sang Joon, against City Of New York, John Or Jane Doe 1-10, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Mitchell J Danziger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMitchell J Danziger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 08, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Police Misconduct) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 30, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 24, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING ORDER - CITY CASES DATED 1/24/2024 |
||
November 30, 2023 | Preliminary Conference Request | ||
November 30, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 14, 2023 | Answer with combined demands | ||
August 08, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.