Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Shanece Gray, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Della Mura, Peter, against Hermany Inc., John Doe, Sucre L. Nolasco-Cruz, represented by Cassella, Brendon Anthony, Moskovits, Ronit Z, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Bianka Perez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 05, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Preliminary Conference and Case Scheduling Order DATED 11/1/2023 |
||
October 27, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 27, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 05, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
September 27, 2021 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS |
||
September 27, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON SUCRE L. NOLASCO-CRUZ |
||
September 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON HERMANY, INC. |
||
September 07, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.