Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Michael Sarkodie-Addo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Krupnik, Alla, against Marvin Shawn Byrd Jr., Mmg Logistics Llc, Mustafa Abdi, represented by Brand, David William, Hammerman, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Patsy Gouldborne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatsy Gouldborne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 26, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 04, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: March 21, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 09, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 04, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 08, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 18, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 15, 2021ORDER - VACATE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 |
ORDER - VACATE (Motion #1) SHORT FORM ORDER AND STIPULATION SO ORDERED DATED 8/11/2023 |
||
May 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Previous HIPAA Authorizations, New Authorizations and All Pertinent Photographs |
||
May 08, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
April 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Notice for D&I & Excerpts |
||
April 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Note of Issue, Certificate of Readiness & Comp Affirm |
||
April 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) PC Order & Case Scheduling Order |
||
April 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) IME report |
||
April 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion |
||
April 04, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1) Affirmation in Good Faith |
||
April 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.