Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lydia Detres, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Smyth, Daniel Eamonn, against 26 Motors Corp., John Doe, represented by Goodman, Henry N, Selvey, Patrick Lyndon, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Bianka Perez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBianka Perez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: April 06, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 30, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 06, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note of Issue: Without Jury (Inquest) |
||
March 30, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) DATED 3/28/2022 |
||
March 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service |
||
March 30, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order w/ Notice of Entry |
||
March 30, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 3/28/2022 |
||
January 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of motion |
||
January 17, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 17, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* Affirmation in Support |
||
January 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.