Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Shane A. Roberts, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Abrams, Ari, against Faroque Mohamed, Giorgi Vasadze, Shomir Uddin Ahmed, represented by Moskovits, Ronit Z, Rothschild, Ethan A, Sandusky, Matteo Giuseppe, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with John A Howard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A Howard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 25, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 21, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 25, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 25, 2024 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
January 24, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 21, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 21, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 09, 2023 | Answer, Combined Demands & Insurance Disclosure | ||
November 01, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER WITH CROSSCLAIM, BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS |
||
November 01, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 30, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.