Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Erick F. Elias, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ofshtein, Akiva, against John Doe A Fictitious Name As True Name Is Unknown To The Plaintiff At This Time, L. D. Paulino Mendez, Uber Technologies Inc, Uber U.S.A. Llc, represented by Kiss, Melinda Margaret, Magardician, Armand, Moskovits, Ronit Z, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Ben Barbato presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBen Barbato Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 08, 2024RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EMERGENCY APPLICATION - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 22, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 08, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) DATED: JANUARY 4, 2024 |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Ledain v. Uber Technologies, Inc., Index No. 526169/2021 (Kings County) |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Certified Mail Tracking Receipt |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Benmelech v. Uber Technologies, Inc., Index No. 702272/2021 (Queens County) |
||
December 22, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
December 22, 2023 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #1) Rivas v. Fnu Samiullah, et. al, Index No. 536325/2022 (Kings County) |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) Natalie Campbell v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al., Index No. 502338/2023 Kings County |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) Lalmi v. Uber Technologies, Inc., Index No. 513027/2022 (Kings County) |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) Theron J. Charles v. Christopher Beeke, et. al, Index No. 529300/2022 (Kings County) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.