Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Douglas Gilliens, Jashawn Richardson, Lonnell Richardson, Vicky Richardson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Newborough, Bruce A., against Anthony Zapata, Mohammed Ayaz, Turo Inc., Turo Transportation Inc, represented by Cook, Donna Lynn, Depalma, Yousra Abdulfattah, Palomino, Zachary J., Rush, Claire Frances, Smith, Kirby Jermaine, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Supreme with Ben Barbato presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 11, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 09, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 06, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2023ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: April 17, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 09, 2024ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 09, 2024REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: April 19, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 09, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 19, 2024REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: February 02, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: March 15, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 29, 2024STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 18, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 30, 2024ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 09, 2024ANSWER
Date: November 29, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023STIPULATION - SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 07, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 07, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 11, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 07, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 11, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: October 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 26, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Denial of Counterclaims |
||
April 19, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
April 17, 2024 |
ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Answer to Third-Party Complaint with Counterclaim - AKEILE LINDON BROWN, ONE MOMENT LOGISTICS, INC. AND AMAZON.COM SERVICES INC. A/K/A AMAZON .COM INC, AND A/K/A AMAZON |
||
April 09, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1) | ||
April 09, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
April 09, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | ||
April 09, 2024 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #1) Counter Statement of Material Facts |
||
March 15, 2024 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Preliminary Conference and Case Scheduling Order DATED 3/15/2024 |
||
March 11, 2024 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
February 29, 2024 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) signed in counterparts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.