Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cruz Mauricio Rodriguez, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Kessler, Jason Brent, against 40 Bruckner Realty Llc., Consolidated Edison Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Of New York Inc., represented by Grossman, Eran, Mcnulty, Michael Joseph, Salter, Kevin Thornton, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Alison Y Tuitt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: October 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 22, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2023STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 21, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: July 06, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS Bill of Particulars and Demands
Date: September 20, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 24, 2023REQUEST FOR RESTRICTED STATUS
Date: September 20, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS Bill of particulars and demands
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Preliminary Conference and Case Scheduling Order DATED 1/19/2024 |
||
January 19, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Good Faith Letter to Plaintiff |
||
January 18, 2024 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
December 06, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Cert, CD, Demand for BP, Produce, Medicare, Damages, EBT Notice, CD All Parties |
||
December 06, 2023 |
ANSWER 40 Bruckner LLC and 40 Bruckner Realty LLC |
||
December 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 13, 2023 |
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Stip to Withdraw Motion and Extend Time to Answer |
||
November 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 40 BRUCKNER REALTY LLC. |
||
November 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 40 BRUCKNER LLC |
||
October 30, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.