Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jowil Pena, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Subin, Herbert S, against Home Run Sports Bar Restaurant Corp., Parkash 815 Llc, Triera Contracting Inc., represented by Donovan, Cassandra H, Fischetti, Anthony M, Gellman, Michelle A, Kushnir, Leonid, Smith, Rachel Marie, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Paul Alpert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 25, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Plaintiff Counsel objecting to Notice of Intent |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - S&C |
||
November 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support |
||
November 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A - Parkash's Verified Answer |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B - Triera Contracting Inc's Verified Answer |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Letter |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Exhibit C - Parkash's Verified Answer |
||
November 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Exhibit G - Affidavit of Anurag Parkash |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.