Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Marcterline Rockingster, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Weinstein, Jay M., against Democracy Prep Public Schools Inc., in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Veronica G. Hummel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Employment Discrimination) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 11, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 29, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 24, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 18, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS NW Condo Dermand for BP and other discovery demands |
||
August 24, 2022 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated August 24, 2022 |
||
August 18, 2022 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Affidavit of Mailing for 190 FORDHAM STREET REALTY CORP. (190 Fordham St) |
||
August 18, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 11, 2022 |
ANSWER Affidavit of Mailing for LANTERN GROUP FOUNDATION, INC. |
||
July 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AUDUBON HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND CORPORATION |
||
July 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing for AUDUBON HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND CORPORATION |
||
July 29, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING LANTERN GROUP FOUNDATION, INC. |
||
June 30, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.