Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Andrea Gregg Prospective Administrator Of The Estate Of Rosella Gregg, Deceased, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kessler, Mitchell David, against Montefiore Medical Center, represented by Giglio, Eric J, Makris, James Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with John R. Higgitt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 04, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 08, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 04, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 17, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Death Certificate
Date: August 04, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 19, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 19, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2) Medical records requests Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2023STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 03, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2) SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
||
March 13, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) Dated: 3/6/23 |
||
March 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affirmation of Service of Order to Show Cause |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Medical records requests Redacted per 22 NYCRR Medical records requests Redacted |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Decree |
||
March 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support |
||
March 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2) Good Faith Affirmation |
||
March 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons & Complaint |
||
March 09, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Order to Show Cause |
||
March 03, 2023 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.