Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Expedito De Raben Gonzalez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bespechny, Alexander, against Idelfonzo Diaz, Jorge Meteo-Vicente, Miriam Garcia, Ramon Fernandez, represented by Coyne, James Christian, Isserlis, Nancy L, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Ben Barbato presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 24, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 24, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 28, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 24, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 24, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 23, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 27, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
February 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Estimates |
||
February 24, 2022 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
February 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Photos |
||
February 24, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
November 23, 2021 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Dated November 23, 2021 |
||
October 28, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 28, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 27, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
October 27, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.