Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Stacy Roudabush, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Fingerhut, Steven John, Phillips, William K, Randall, Zachary George, against Albert Einstein College Of Medicine Of Yeshiva University, Kamran Khodakhah Individually, represented by Anthony, William Joseph, Callahan, Nicole Ann, Horton, James Fredrick, Schmidt, Jean L., Solimeo, Adriana M., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Supreme with Mary Ann Brigantti presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Employment) |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 22, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 22, 2024BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 12, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 22, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 11, 2024DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 11, 2024ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 16, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 30, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 22, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 13, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 04, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 11, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 07, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 10, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2023STIPULATION - SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Frist Set of Requests for Documents |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Answer |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint |
||
April 22, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) | ||
April 22, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) | ||
March 12, 2024 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Amended Bill of Particulars |
||
March 11, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Combined Demands |
||
March 11, 2024 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
February 06, 2024 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.