Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
David Adames, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brar, Udeyveer Singh, Cupelli, Francesco, Demidov, Andrey, Elefterakis, Nicholas, Friedman, Taylor Mical, (total of 5) See All against A. Duie Pyle, Inc., Michael Edward Martin, represented by Goldman, David M., Gross, Aaron C, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Patsy Gouldborne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatsy Gouldborne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI)
Date: January 22, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 13, 2024NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI)
Date: January 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 13, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 13, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 11, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 10, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 08, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 04, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI) Notice of AMENDED Notice of Removal |
||
January 22, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Service |
||
January 18, 2024 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Preliminary Conference Order and Case Scheduling Order Dated 1/17/2024 |
||
January 13, 2024 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference |
||
January 13, 2024 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention |
||
January 13, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service and Blue Back |
||
January 13, 2024 | Affirmation of Good Faith | ||
January 11, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Good Faith Letter dated 1/10/2024 |
||
January 04, 2024 |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) Notice of Filing with Notice of Removal |
||
January 04, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.