Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gean Plummer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Davidowitz, Craig L, against Daniel M. Messia, The City Of New York, The New York City Police Department, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Mitchell J Danziger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: August 17, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 22, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 22, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING ORDER - CITY CASES DATED 8/15/2023 |
||
May 22, 2023 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
May 22, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
May 22, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 11, 2023 | Answer with combined demands | ||
April 13, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
April 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.