Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Derwin D. Richards, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shalom, Jonathan, against New York City Fire Department, The City Of New York, represented by , in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Mitchell J Danziger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 22, 2024ANSWER
Date: July 09, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 06, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 31, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING CASE SCHEDULING ORDER - CITY CASES DATED 1/16/2024 |
||
November 06, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 06, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 09, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
March 31, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
March 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B- Notice of Claim re FDNY (redacted) |
||
March 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Notice of Claim re City of NY (redacted) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.