Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jocelyn Surinach As Proposed Administrator Of The Goods, Chattels, And Credits Which Were Of Jose Reyes, Deceased, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fogel, Joshua, Morano, Maria K., Turret, David B., against Southern Medical Group, St. Barnabas Hospital Health System, represented by Aronov, Rita F., Weinmann, Kurt Lee, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with John R. Higgitt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 25, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2022STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 11, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 09, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 08, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2022 |
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE - SO ORDERED DATED 05/10/2022 |
||
May 09, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
March 09, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
March 08, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) 3/3/22 Decision/Order of Hon. Michael A. Frishman |
||
March 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of 3/3/22 Decision/Order - amending caption |
||
March 08, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Multiple discovery demands |
||
March 08, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service |
||
March 08, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
March 08, 2022 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
March 04, 2022 |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 3/3/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.