Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Juan Padilla, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ashe, Adam Scott, against City Of New York, Innovative Property Management & Development, Inc. And, New Beginning Community Redevelopment Corp.,, New Vision Community Redevelopment Hdfc,, represented by Bell, Lateef A., Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Mitchell J Danziger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injuries) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 25, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 13, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 13, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 15, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING CASE SCHEDULING ORDER - CITY CASES DATED 1/23/2024 |
||
November 13, 2023 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention |
||
November 13, 2023 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference |
||
April 26, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
March 28, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Complaint |
||
March 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 15, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.