Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Keith Stone Jr. As Administrator Of The Goods, Chattels, And Credits Which Were Of Keith T. Stone, Sr., Deceased, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fogel, Joshua, Morano, Maria K., Tegtmeier, Carl B., Turret, David B., against Jamaica Hospital Medical Center, Ortmayer Materials Handling Inc., P.M.O. Jamaica, Ltd., Raul Avila Inc., represented by Berger, Jacqueline Diane, Carey, Patrick George, Gilfillan, Curtis Bruce, Lanzone, Stephen Christopher, Meade, John Steger, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with John R Higgitt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 05, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 09, 2021STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: May 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 11, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 11, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 03, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 24, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 11, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2022ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: February 16, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 17, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: March 17, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 13, 2022THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: July 27, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 26, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 12, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 11, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: May 05, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 30, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 27, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 08, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 11, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 12, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 13, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 28, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 18, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 06, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 17, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 19, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 20, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 24, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 31, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 07, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 07, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 01, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 21, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 01, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: May 24, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 26, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE SO ORDERED 5/23/2023 |
||
May 25, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) Short Form Order & Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice Dated 5/24/2023 |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Second Third Party Defendant/ Third-party Plaintiff Complaint |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint |
||
May 24, 2023 |
THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected* Third Third- Party Summons and Complaint |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Answer |
||
May 16, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
May 01, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion Pro Hace Vice |
||
May 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Affirmation of Adam Kipnis, Esq. |
||
May 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of John E. Tyrrell, Esq. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.