Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Spinelli, Victor, against Casey Williams, As Heir To The Estate Of A. Mae Williams A K A Archie Mae Williams, John Doe #1-5 And Jane Doe #1-5 Said Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, Midland Funding Llc, New York City Environmental Control Board, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 6) See All represented by Adelsberg, Howard Michael, Basoglu, Mehmet, Gura, John E., Tordesillas, Bernard James, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Master Foreclosure Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaster Foreclosure Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 03, 2021COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 04, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 13, 2022SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: January 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: March 03, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 17, 2023NOTICE ONLINE RECEIPT
Date: March 15, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER DATED 03/09/2023 |
||
March 15, 2023 |
NOTICE ONLINE RECEIPT ONLINE RECEIPT Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 03, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
January 12, 2023 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) | ||
October 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 13, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT AFF OF MAILING |
||
October 11, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE (Motion #001) GAL DECLINED APPTMT |
||
October 04, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Order of Publication Dated 9/23/2022 |
||
September 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 11, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.