Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
First American Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against Ama Appiah Fosu A K A Appiah A. Fosu A K A Tina A. Owusuaah, And John Doe And Mary Doe,, Charles Dapaah A K A Charles O. Dapaah, Clearview Capital Corporation, New York City Environmental Control Board, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Master Foreclosure Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 10, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 10, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 29, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 23, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 05, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
December 08, 2020 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 08, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
December 04, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE "JOHN DOE" (REFUSED NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2 - AOS |
||
December 04, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE "JOHN DOE" (REFUSED NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1 - AOS |
||
December 02, 2020 | NOTICE OF ABSENCE | ||
November 30, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU - AOS |
||
November 20, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/"JOHN DOE" (REFUSED NAME) AS JOHN DOE # 2 |
||
November 20, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/"JOHN DOE" (REFUSED NAME) AS JOHN DOE # 1 |
||
November 17, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/CHARLES DAPAAH A/K/A CHARLES O DAPAAH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.