Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carlton L. Moitt Jr. As Administrator Of The Estate Of Cynthia Moitt, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fruhling, Michael A, against Elena Vezza Md, Throgs Neck Operating Co.Llc, Throgs Neck Rehabilitation & Nursing Center, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Joseph E Capella presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Capella Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 29, 2021SUMMONS
Date: December 31, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 31, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 27, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 27, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 02, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 22, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 08, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 01, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 12, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 29, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 29, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: February 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Notice of Med Mal Action
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Bill of Particulars ( Amended Complaint) for Elena Vezza, M.D. and Dr Vezza Medical Ser Demand for a Bill of Particulars ( Amended Complaint) for Elena Vezza, M.D. and Dr Vezza Medical Ser ... show more |
||
June 22, 2022 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Answer to Amended Complaint for Elena Vezza, M.D. and Dr Vezza Medical Services P.C. |
||
February 07, 2022 |
ORDER - EXTENDING TIME (Motion #001) Short Form Order Dated 1/27/2022 |
||
November 01, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Preliminary Conference Order |
||
October 28, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Copy of letter that was sent to all counsel |
||
August 31, 2021 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Address |
||
August 02, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry |
||
June 08, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
June 08, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.