Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Janet Kelly Deceased, By James Kelly, As Proposed Executor Of Her Estate,, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Caccese, Carolyn Marie, against Seniorcare Emergency Medical Services, represented by Atlas, Betty Leigh, Rancourt, John Peter, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Michael Frishman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Frishman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 27, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: September 17, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 05, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 01, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Decision and Order with Notice of Entry |
||
February 23, 2022 |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001) dated 2/18/2022. |
||
October 01, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation |
||
September 27, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
September 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A Affidavits of Urgency |
||
September 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B Emails to Surrogates Court |
||
September 17, 2021 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
August 05, 2021 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stipulation to Adjourn Motion |
||
July 08, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
||
July 08, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.