Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Devon Holmes, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Inwald, Scott, against Stephen Burke, represented by Gouvitsas, Panagiotis, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Mary Ann Brigantti presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time51 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 20, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 21, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 13, 2020ANSWER
Date: October 20, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 21, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 21, 2020 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 20, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 20, 2020 | Answer with Demands | ||
October 14, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 23, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.