Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Latrice Kinard, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gonzalez, Argenis Steven, Ross, Matthew J, against Juvenex Manhattan, Inc, represented by Alexander, Brenn Erica Rose, Delp, Dustin Scott, Heermance, Brian P., Simmons, Jacqulyn Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Adrian N Armstrong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Burn) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 08, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 26, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: November 22, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: October 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: April 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2019STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: October 18, 2018ANSWER
Date: December 14, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 04, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 04, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #003)
Date: December 03, 2019STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003)
Date: December 05, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 04, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 08, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: November 22, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 17, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 30, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 30, 2017CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 22, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2020STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 23, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2020ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 28, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: September 03, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2020NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 22, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
August 04, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 02, 2020 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
September 03, 2020 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 28, 2020 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #004) Examination Before Trial Dated: 7/23/2020 |
||
June 23, 2020 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.