Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Araceli Aguilar, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Order To Show Cause) case represented by Karlin, David A, against Parkchester Security Public Safety Department, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Donald Miles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Miles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Order To Show Cause) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time39 days |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 14, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2020STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 14, 2020PETITION
Date: September 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Short Form Order Dated 10/15/2020 and Signed Order to Show Cause Dated 09/21/2020 |
||
October 13, 2020 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 14, 2020 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 14, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
September 14, 2020 | PETITION | ||
September 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Letter to Parkchester Security/Public Safety |
||
September 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR Police Accident Report Redacted |
||
September 14, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.