Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alberto Almanzar, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against 1970 University, Llc.,, represented by Mcspedon, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Doris Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: August 11, 2020COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: July 31, 2020CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: July 31, 2020RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: July 31, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: October 22, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 10, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: August 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER DATED 7/28/2022 |
||
October 22, 2020 |
COURT NOTICE Mediation Program |
||
August 11, 2020 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
August 11, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Order appealed from |
||
August 11, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 11, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
July 31, 2020 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
July 31, 2020 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
July 31, 2020 | RJI -RE: OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.