Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Sherman, Hon. Howard H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2014 |
CategoryTort-Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled Pre Trial Cal. Room 711 Judge: Victor, Hon. Paul A. |
|
October 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Pre Trial Cal. Room 711 Supreme Initial (first time on); NEW (Conversion) Judge: Victor, Hon. Paul A. |
|
January 22, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Cc Disc Mo PP (Conversion) Judge: Douglas, Hon. Laura G. |
|
January 22, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Cc Disc Mo PP (Conversion) Judge: Douglas, Hon. Laura G. |
|
January 22, 2015 | Hearing |
Held Compliance Cal - 9:30 A.M. Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Douglas, Hon. Laura G. |
|
January 12, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Compliance Cal - 9:30 A.M. Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Douglas, Hon. Laura G. |
|
January 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Submission Motions-Room 217 04 (Conversion) Judge: Sherman, Hon. Howard H. |
|
December 22, 2014 | Motion |
Strike Pleadings (Motion #001) Decided: 01/22/2015Granted Before Justice: Douglas, Hon. Laura G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Douglas, Hon. Laura G. |
|
April 23, 2014 | Hearing |
Held PC Calendar Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Douglas, Hon. Laura G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.