Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
O. Benjamin Okpeseyi, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mosaku, Adewale Akim, against Montefiore Medical Center, represented by Massen, Nina, Schmidt, Jean L., in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Donald Miles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Miles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Employment Discrimination) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 11, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 11, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 11, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 |
COURT NOTICE Mediation Program |
||
October 14, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
October 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #001) Notice of Rejection of Untimely FIled Answer |
||
October 07, 2020 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant |
||
October 07, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Nina Massen in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant |
||
October 07, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Answer |
||
October 07, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) September 8, 2020 email chain |
||
October 07, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) September 14, 2020 email chain |
||
October 07, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) August 26, 2020 email |
||
October 07, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Verified Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.