Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Kenneth L. Thompson, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth L. Thompson, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time1 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) IA Motion 20 Judge: Thompson, Hon. Kenneth |
|
March 07, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE IA MOTION 20 Judge: KENNETH L. THOMPSON JR. |
|
February 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) IA Motion 20 Judge: Thompson, Hon. Kenneth |
|
February 29, 2016 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED IA MOTION 20 Judge: KENNETH L. THOMPSON JR. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Motion |
Contempt (Motion #003) Decided: 03/07/2016Granted Before Justice: Thompson, Hon. Kenneth Answer demanded: No Judge: Thompson, Hon. Kenneth |
|
February 11, 2016 | Motion |
CONTEMPT OF COURT (Motion #003) Decided: 03/07/2016PD - MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: KENNETH L. THOMPSON JR. Answer demanded: No Judge: KENNETH L. THOMPSON JR. |
|
September 28, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) IA Motion 20 Judge: Thompson, Hon. Kenneth |
|
September 28, 2015 | Hearing |
PD - FULLY SUBMITTED IA MOTION 20 Judge: KENNETH L. THOMPSON JR. |
|
September 23, 2015 | Motion |
Renew/Reargue/Resettle/Reconsider (Motion #002) Decided: 01/05/2016Denied Before Justice: Thompson, Hon. Kenneth Answer demanded: No Judge: Thompson, Hon. Kenneth |
|
September 23, 2015 | Motion |
REARGUE/RENEW/RESETTLE/RECONSI (Motion #002) Decided: 01/05/2016PD - MOTION DENIED Before Justice: KENNETH L. THOMPSON JR. Answer demanded: No Judge: KENNETH L. THOMPSON JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.