Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kenneth Wilder, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Asher, Roberta D, against 1981 Realty Corp., represented by Filardi, Elizabeth Ann, Titowsky, Michael B., in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Julia Rodriguez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time1151 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 29, 2015DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 05, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 24, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 01, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 30, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 14, 2016ANSWER
Date: November 05, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 19, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 03, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) Notice of Entry with Order |
||
October 19, 2018 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 10/18/2018 |
||
May 24, 2018 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 5/18/2018 |
||
May 24, 2018 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service for Notice of Entry |
||
May 24, 2018 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #004) Order with Notice of Entry |
||
May 03, 2018 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #004) Order to Show Cause-Comformed Copy |
||
May 03, 2018 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004) AFFIDAVIT OF MAIL SERVICE |
||
April 30, 2018 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
||
April 30, 2018 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
||
April 30, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) LETTER TO DEFT VIA FAX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.