Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lazaro Sanchez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lescott, Nadia Y, Ronemus, Michael B, against Chan Ying, Chi Hung, Extra Space Storage Inc., Gabriel Castano, Jerilynn Horton, (total of 5) See All represented by Backman, Heather A, Comiskey, John M, Giuffra, Elyse Nichole, Goldstein, Scott H., Liebhauser, Lynda, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Doris Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDoris Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions678 days |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time689 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 08, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #014) *Corrected*
Date: October 12, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #015)
Date: April 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #011)
Date: January 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #013)
Date: May 21, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #012)
Date: February 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #011)
Date: January 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #011)
Date: November 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: July 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #010)
Date: January 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: June 20, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: June 05, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #009) *Corrected*
Date: October 11, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #014)
Date: October 16, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #016)
Date: August 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #011)
Date: January 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #013)
Date: February 09, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: September 04, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #015)
Date: March 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #010)
Date: December 31, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #013)
Date: February 09, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER (Motion #014)
Date: October 15, 2018ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #015)
Date: April 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #015)
Date: May 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #016)
Date: August 05, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #015)
Date: July 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #016)
Date: August 23, 2019ORDER - INTERIM (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #012)
Date: February 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: July 28, 2017REMITTITUR
Date: January 29, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #012)
Date: March 01, 2018ANSWER
Date: February 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #014)
Date: September 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #015)
Date: March 08, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #014)
Date: February 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #014)
Date: October 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #015)
Date: May 16, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #016)
Date: September 09, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #013)
Date: May 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #013)
Date: April 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #014)
Date: November 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #012)
Date: April 16, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #015)
Date: May 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #010)
Date: October 24, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #014)
Date: March 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #012)
Date: April 02, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #015)
Date: March 08, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #009) *Corrected*
Date: October 11, 2017ANSWER
Date: January 10, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: August 01, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #010)
Date: January 04, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: September 23, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #011)
Date: December 12, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: October 21, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 04, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: November 08, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: June 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 17, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #011)
Date: November 13, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: August 02, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2015THIRD-PARTY ANSWER
Date: October 13, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 14, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 08, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: January 04, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: March 27, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 19, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: December 14, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 28, 2014ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #013)
Date: August 08, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: December 22, 2016ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #011)
Date: August 08, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #008)
Date: June 30, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #010)
Date: October 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #006)
Date: October 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: November 08, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 24, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 24, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: February 11, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 26, 2014ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #012)
Date: August 08, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 01, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 23, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: September 23, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 06, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: September 10, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 26, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 02, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: May 08, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 25, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 13, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED NOVEMBER 14, 2019 |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - INTERIM (Motion #016) DATED 8/27/2019 |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #016) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 9/5/2019 |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #016) Reply Affirmation |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #016) | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #015) Order with Notice of Entry as to Decsion & Order dated 7/22/19 |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #015) | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #015) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.