Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gisela Fobar, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gardy, Craig I, Levy, Joseph D, against Abc Company, A Fictitious Name Used To Dentoe An Unknown Defendant, Arco Elevator Co. Inc., Edel Family Management Corp., Majestic Realty Corp., represented by Doolan, Robert J, Gottlieb, Michael H, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Lizbeth Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time825 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: June 02, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 28, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2013STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001)
Date: June 20, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 12, 2013ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2013STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 20, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: October 29, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: August 16, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 20, 2013NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: January 15, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 12, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 17, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: June 23, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 27, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER SFO & STIPULATION SO-ORDERED DATED 7/15/2014 |
|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) | |
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001) stipulation adjourning motion |
|
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) | |
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER SFO DATED 1/21/2014 |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.