Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Kalimar Feliciano, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Asta, Michael J, Felicetti, Scott Arthur, against Adee Realty, Llc, represented by Castelli, Meredith Blair, Curley, Amy J, Fiorella, Kenneth S, Greenspan, Stewart Barry, Meisels, Grant Michael, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Llinet Rosado presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2014ANSWER
Date: August 07, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: April 21, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: November 17, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2013RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: October 02, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 10, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 17, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 08, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2013LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 19, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 24, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: June 12, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 17, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 12, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 05, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 05, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 24, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 11, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 13, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING statement of Authorization |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) substitution of Attorney |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER DECISION/ORDER DATED 3/8/2019 |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 12/6/2018 |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER DATED 8/14/2018 |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER DATED 7/12/2018 |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 5/25/2018 |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.