Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Benito H. Brown, Constance Brown, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Felicetti, Scott Arthur, against Arif M. Choudhry, Ashley Puntiel, represented by Garrison, Michelle L, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Mary Ann Brigantti presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1548 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 09, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 5/8/2017 |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Police Report |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss in Lieu of an Answer |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.