Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jose Geronimo-Figueroa, Michael D. Delacruz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aceste, Vincent J, Aminov, Ariel, against Hector A. Concepcion Suriel, represented by Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Mary Ann Brigantti presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time701 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: September 18, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: June 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: June 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: August 13, 2018ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #005)
Date: December 02, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 25, 2019STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 18, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 12, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 28, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 25, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: November 30, 2018ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002)
Date: September 13, 2018ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: August 01, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: August 01, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: May 04, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: May 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: May 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: April 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 13, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 13, 2018SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: April 10, 2018ANSWER
Date: April 10, 2018ANSWER
Date: February 26, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 18, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #005) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 11/15/2019 |
|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) SOD to Hector Concepcion Suriel |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005) Summary Judgment Threshold |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance for Michael Delacruz |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #005) Transcript of Plaintiff JOSE GERONIMO FIGUEROA |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #005) Medical Report Dr. Mann |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) Verified Bill of Particulars |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) Summons and Complaint Answers |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #005) Affidavit of Service |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #005) Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.