Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jacqueline Avilas, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ajlouny, Paul, Lucciola, Gerard A, against Frank Barcia, represented by Gross, Robert Steven, Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Lizbeth Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1598 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 07, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 17, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: May 22, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: February 05, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED *Corrected*
Date: August 01, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: February 22, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 08, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 19, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 09, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 22, 2015ANSWER
Date: February 24, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 9/6/2017 |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED *Corrected* DATED 7/20/2017. |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 6/29/2016 |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Stipulation of Substitution |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Services |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Police Report |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion to Renew/Reargue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.