Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Richard A. Ball As Commissioner Of Agriculture And Markets Of The State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Swartz, Larry Allan, against Jl Deli Grocery Corp. D B A Jl Deli Grocery, in the jurisdiction of Albany County. This case was filed in Albany County Superior Courts with James H Ferreira presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 24, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions931 days |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time931 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 09, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 31, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2017 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
May 12, 2017 |
JUDGMENT Entered by Clerk |
||
May 12, 2017 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
May 12, 2017 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
April 07, 2017 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 07, 2017 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 31, 2017 |
ORDER - OTHER entered by the clerk |
||
November 09, 2015 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 09, 2015 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 09, 2015 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.