Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rashbi Management, Inc., filed a(n) Workers Compensation - Labor and Employment case represented by Policelli, Frank, against Diamond Hill Nursing And Rehabilitation Center Nka Collar City Nursing And Rehabilitation Center, Oriska Insurance Company, represented by Buckey, Christopher Edward, Chorba, Timothy Aloysius, Faso, Nicholas John, Lipsius, Ira S, Usinger, Elizabeth, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with Peter A Lynch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter A Lynch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Workers Comp App For Judgment |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeWorkers Compensation |
COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2022WORKERS COMPENSATION APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 21, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 21, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: January 26, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 26, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 26, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 06, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 14, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #1) EXH 6-2006-11-28; Rashbi Trust |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #1) EXH 7-2014-04-07; Rashbi Mgmt Grantor, IDB Bank Trustee, Oriska Beneficiary,Trust Agreement |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) EXH 2-So-Order Stipulation of Settlement Kings County 10608-2012 |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) EXH 8-2019-09-04; 18cv1030 Remand to State Court |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) EXH 1-2013-01-17; DECISION AND ORDER Kings County Index No. 10608-12 |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #1) EXH 9-2013-02-01; OIC-NYS Dept of Financial Order Pursuant to Ins Law 1310 |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) EXH 3-02-17-23 WCB Amended Panel Decision LS Redacted |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) EXH 4-WCB Pantzer in Case G2731970 Decision filed 10-14-2020 |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #1) EXH 12-Sentosa - Wausau Bus. Ins. Co. v. Sentosa Care LLC_ 10 F. Supp. 3rd 444 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.