Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by , against Habibi 1 Deli, Inc., Pelcees S. Saedi, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: October 18, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: October 18, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: December 16, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: December 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
December 16, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Additional Mailing w/ SWN |
||
December 16, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of Summons with Notice |
||
December 12, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Service of Summons CPLR 3215(g) (4) & BCL306(B) |
||
December 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SOS Aos |
||
December 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 01, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
October 18, 2022 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.