Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Richard A. Ball, Commissioner Of Agriculture And Markets Of The State Of New York, filed a(n) Other Matters - Agriculture/Market case represented by Howard, Katie Elizabeth, against Rania Deli Grocery Corp D B A Rania Deli Grocery, 554 Morris Ave., Bronx, New York 10451, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with David A Weinstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A Weinstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Agriculture/Market |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
|
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 17, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 17, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: October 17, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 12, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for OPI |
||
December 21, 2022 | Notice of Entry for OPI | ||
December 12, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 30, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Order of Preliminary Injunction |
||
November 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RANIA DELI GROCERY CORP d/b/a Rania Deli Grocery |
||
November 10, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION |
||
October 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Sanitary Inspection Report |
||
October 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Sanitary Inspection Reports |
||
October 17, 2022 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
October 17, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.