Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital Communications Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Anthony M Marsilio, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: October 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 03, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 06, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 13, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 06, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
April 12, 2022 |
JUDGMENT entered by clerk |
||
April 06, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing a Copy of the Summons | ||
April 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Facts Redacted |
||
April 06, 2022 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitation | ||
April 06, 2022 | Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status | ||
October 14, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
October 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 07, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.