Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Asset Security Consulting, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Sale / Transfer) case represented by Brandimarte, Luigi, against S R Vanderhorst, Transamerica, Wiltonre Annuity Service Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with James H Ferreira presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Sale / Transfer) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time90 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 22, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: August 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: September 09, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 05, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: September 09, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 29, 2020PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: September 09, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 30, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: August 03, 2020PETITION
Date: July 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Decision and Order 10.28.20 |
||
October 28, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-MOTION FERREIRA (Court Activity) Judge: JAMES H. FERREIRA |
|
October 28, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) FERREIRA (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES H. FERREIRA |
|
September 22, 2020 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 09, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Expense Report/Debt Payoff |
||
September 09, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Amended Transfer Agreement |
||
September 09, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Amended Disclosure Statement |
||
September 09, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 09, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Bonus Letter |
||
September 09, 2020 | PETITION (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.