Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Olkeriil, Maria Irene T., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vogt, Dieter Hans Helmut, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Agreement 933210-Agreement Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner AGREEMENT [933210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
May 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931220-OSC Hearing (Initial); Olkeriil, M. vs. Vogt, D. Motion OSC Details: 921310 - Cust/Chd Supp/Spsl Supp/Visitation ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Additional Info : Atty Fees and Costs Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order: Show Cause 914221-Order: Show Cause (Initial) Motion/OSC Detail: 921310 - Cust/Chd Supp/Spsl Supp/Visitation Add'l Description: Atty Fees and Costs Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner ORDER: SHOW CAUSE (INITIAL) [914221] Motion: CUST/CHD SUPP/SPSL SUPP/VISITATION [921310] Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 912510-Correspondence Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk CORRESPONDENCE [912510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued and Filed 922120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner SUMMONS: FILED [922120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition 912110-Petition Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner PETITION [912110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense 933610-Income and Expense Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner INCOME AND EXPENSE [933610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.