Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jennifer A Gula, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Haskin, Michelle Lee, against Robert J Gula, represented by Assaf, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with James H Ferreira presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Ferreira Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 26, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
August 04, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 19, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 27, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
April 20, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
April 08, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
April 08, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
March 07, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.