Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Richard A. Ball As Commissioner Of Agriculture And Markets Of The State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Arnold, Frederick B., Swartz, Larry Allan, against Norman Alexander D B A Christopher Deli, in the jurisdiction of Albany County. This case was filed in Albany County Superior Courts Albany County Supreme Court with Denise Ann Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 01, 2015 |
CategoryOther |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions480 days |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseAlbany County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time481 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: January 24, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 14, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 10, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Entered by Clerk |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Affidavit and SCRA Status Report |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER entered by the clerk |
|
October 05, 2016 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT HARTMAN (Court Activity) Judge: DENISE A. HARTMAN |
|
October 05, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) HARTMAN (Motion Part) Judge: DENISE A. HARTMAN |
|
August 15, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) HARTMAN (Motion Part) Judge: DENISE A. HARTMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.