Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with DEBRA J. YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEBRA J. YOUNG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management22 days |
Filing DateMay 02, 2019 |
||
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
||
Case Cycle Time39 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED YOUNG (Court Activity) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
June 10, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
June 07, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
May 24, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE YOUNG (Prelim. Conference) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
May 24, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MCNALLY, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: RICHARD J. MCNALLY, JR. |
|
May 02, 2019 | Motion |
Certified Copies Of Vital Reco (Motion #001) Decided: 06/10/2019GRANTED Before Justice: DEBRA J. YOUNG Answer demanded: No Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
May 02, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.