Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management52 days |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2016 |
CategoryArticle 78 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
|
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Case Cycle Time286 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DISMISSED MCCARTHY (Court Activity) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
January 30, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
July 27, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
July 22, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
July 22, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
July 13, 2016 | Motion |
Dismiss Petition (Motion #002) Decided: 07/27/2016DENIED. DEC/ORD. RESPS GIVEN 3 Before Justice: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY Answer demanded: No Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
July 13, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
June 10, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE MCCARTHY (Prelim. Conference) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
June 10, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) HARTMAN (Motion Part) Judge: DENISE A. HARTMAN |
|
April 19, 2016 | Motion |
Vacate Decision (Motion #001) Decided: 01/30/2017DISMISSED Before Justice: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY Answer demanded: No Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.