Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Albany County. This case was filed in Albany County Superior Courts with GERARD E. MANEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2019 |
CategoryArticle 78 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time53 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED MANEY (Court Activity) Judge: GERARD E. MANEY |
|
June 21, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MANEY (Motion Part) Judge: GERARD E. MANEY |
|
June 21, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MANEY (Motion Part) Judge: GERARD E. MANEY |
|
May 10, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MANEY (Motion Part) Judge: GERARD E. MANEY |
|
May 10, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MANEY (Motion Part) Judge: GERARD E. MANEY |
|
May 06, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) MANEY (Motion Part) Judge: GERARD E. MANEY |
|
May 06, 2019 | Motion |
Dismiss Petition (Motion #002) Decided: 06/21/2019DISMISSED Before Justice: GERARD E. MANEY Answer demanded: No Judge: GERARD E. MANEY |
|
April 29, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MANEY (Motion Part) Judge: GERARD E. MANEY |
|
April 29, 2019 | Motion |
Vacate Determination (Motion #001) Decided: 06/21/2019GRANTED Before Justice: GERARD E. MANEY Answer demanded: No Judge: GERARD E. MANEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.