Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2015 |
CategoryArticle 78 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time58 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED MCCARTHY (Court Activity) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
May 08, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
May 08, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
May 01, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
May 01, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
April 27, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
April 27, 2015 | Motion |
Dismiss Petition (Motion #002) Decided: 05/08/2015GRANTED Before Justice: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY Answer demanded: No Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
March 11, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
March 11, 2015 | Motion |
Vacate Decision (Motion #001) Decided: 05/08/2015PETITION DISMISSED Before Justice: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY Answer demanded: No Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.